Financial history THE RICHMOND FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 200453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £39.10m £38.64m £48.88m £46.48m £46.15m
Total expenditure £39.39m £38.77m £48.25m £47.09m £44.91m
Income from government contracts £17.65m £23.25m £19.50m £37.30m £21.38m
Income from government grants £0 £77.00k N/A N/A £187.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £83.00k £59.87k £196.80k £96.14k
Income - Other trading activities £312.00k £684.00k £892.23k £260.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities £38.54m £37.63m £45.72m £45.68m £45.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £253.00k £244.00k £282.00k £213.00k £156.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.93m £127.00k £728.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £191.55k £36.23k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £39.08m £38.39m £48.25m £46.73m £44.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £119.00k £116.00k £83.00k £139.75k £138.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £312.00k £381.00k £0 £364.00k £0