Governance THE RICHMOND FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 200453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 20 September 1961: Standard registration
  • 24 February 2016: Funds received from 1016959 RICHMOND FELLOWSHIP EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING
  • 25 April 2016: Funds received from 1145283 ISLE OF WIGHT ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH
  • 17 May 2017: Funds received from 1025395 THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON COUNCIL ON ADDICTION
  • 22 May 2017: Funds received from 1074684 CROFTLANDS TRUST
  • 22 May 2017: Funds received from 207893 2 CARE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property