Trustees THE RICHMOND FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 200453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul John Najsarek Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Susan Anne Moore Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Maureen Hopcroft Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Ian Edward Ayling Trustee 02 June 2021
None on record
Robert Templeton Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
June Riley Trustee 01 March 2020
AQUARIUS ACTION PROJECTS
Received: On time
Dr Kapil Bakshi Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Jonathan Royle Trustee 01 September 2018
BRADFORD VCS ALLIANCE LIMITED
Recently registered
Dr Rachel Perkins Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Tracey Bell Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record
Albert Fletcher Trustee 01 April 2017
AQUARIUS ACTION PROJECTS
Received: On time
HELEN EDWARDS Trustee 01 April 2016
PEABODY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Alan Powell Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Derek Caren Trustee 16 August 2012
VOLUNTARY SECTOR MENTAL HEALTH PROVIDERS FORUM
Received: On time