HARMAN ATWOOD FOR ALMSHOUSES AND CURATES HOUSE

Charity number: 200553
Charity reporting is overdue by 1490 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £17.07k £16.07k £14.23k £14.76k £17.35k
Total expenditure £11.12k £16.15k £15.32k £21.28k £19.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A