OCKLEY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £7.85k £7.74k £7.88k £10.39k £10.03k
Total expenditure £7.63k £6.72k £7.93k £8.82k £7.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A