PARTIS COLLEGE

Charity number: 200606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 July 2017 On time Download