Trustees PARTIS COLLEGE
Charity number: 200606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Laing Davies | Chair | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Bromley | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Dennis | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN FRANCES TOLAND | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|||||
David Mark Phillips | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Barrett | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Magdalen Goodbody | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Exton | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Bowman | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Atwell | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.