Financial history STANDLAKE WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 200614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £5.11k £5.21k £5.31k £3.16k £5.48k
Total expenditure £2.03k £3.03k £2.84k £2.21k £2.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A