GORDON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 200668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £30.37k £21.26k £5.95k £25.80k £722
Total expenditure £14.88k £17.16k £14.56k £16.36k £15.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A