Financial history HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN HEYTESBURY

Charity number: 200669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £288.44k £288.86k £283.09k £266.33k £297.64k
Total expenditure £244.71k £270.85k £276.44k £308.71k £285.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A