Trustees HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN HEYTESBURY

Charity number: 200669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR TIM ETCHELLS Chair 06 March 2015
None on record
Richard Blandy Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Clive Gibson Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Susan Neville Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Jonathan Paul Wansey Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Amanda Cheesley Trustee 09 March 2020
THE SIRONA FOUNDATION
Received: 12 days late
Christine Leback Sitwell Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Rev Trudy Hobson Trustee 06 December 2019
None on record
ANTONY ANDREW MACPHERSON PINSENT Trustee 23 September 2016
None on record
Rev ROBIN NICHOLAS HUNGERFORD Trustee 04 October 2013
THE FRIENDS OF ST LEONARD'S CHURCH FARLEIGH HUNGERFORD
Received: On time