BOXMOOR AND BERKHAMSTED (POST OFFICE) BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 200710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.01k £9.27k £874 £1.49k £4.27k
Total expenditure £12.13k £124.09k £60.00k £4.12k £18.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A