Accounts and annual returns CHURCH OR PARISH LANDS

Charity number: 200711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 19 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 02 November 2020 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 05 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required