Trustees CHURCH OR PARISH LANDS

Charity number: 200711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR STEWART BENZIE Chair 02 October 1990
FAIRFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
FAIRFORD & DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Wendy Graham Trustee 23 January 2018
None on record
Annette Stannard Trustee 23 January 2018
None on record
REV Caroline Symcox Trustee 31 March 2015
CHARITY OF LADY MICO AND OTHERS
Received: On time
Anthony John Emmerson Trustee 31 March 2015
None on record
Julie Yells Trustee 01 March 2015
None on record
CAROL THOMPSON Trustee 27 October 2000
None on record
WENDY JANET STEBBING Trustee 17 March 1993
None on record