Governance THE ABBEYFIELD SOCIETY

Charity number: 200719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 02 January 2014: Funds received from 268765 ABBEYFIELD (DORCHESTER) SOCIETY LIMITED
  • 05 November 2015: Funds received from 501840 THE SHREWSBURY ABBEYFIELD SOCIETY LTD
  • 08 August 2017: Funds received from 232276 THE ABBEYFIELD BLACKPOOL SOCIETY LIMITED
  • 07 March 2019: Funds received from 289439 GOLDEN HOURS FELLOWSHIP LIMITED
  • 13 March 2019: Funds received from 268984 THE ABBEYFIELD WELLINGTON (SOMERSET) SOCIETY LIMIT...
  • 02 April 2019: Funds received from 200719-18 THE ABBEYFIELD AXMINSTER SOCIETY LIMITED
  • 02 April 2019: Funds received from 200719-21 LEE HOUSE, WIMBLEDON
  • 02 April 2019: Funds received from 200719-23 THE ABBEYFIELD (HIGH WYCOMBE) SOCIETY LIMITED
  • 02 April 2019: Funds received from 200719-19 THE ABBEYFIELD KIDDERMINSTER SOCIETY LIMITED
  • 05 April 2019: Funds received from 200719-22 ABBEYFIELD RESIDENTIAL CARE HELPLINE (LONDON SW)
  • 07 May 2019: Funds received from 200719-17 THE ABBEYFIELD MID SUSSEX SOCIETY LIMITED
  • 12 October 2020: Funds received from 214679 THE ABBEYFIELD SCARBOROUGH SOCIETY LIMITED
  • 22 January 2021: Funds received from 202045 THE ABBEYFIELD BOGNOR REGIS SOCIETY LIMITED
  • 14 May 2021: Funds received from 1003538 THE RAYMOND COLMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ABBEYFIELD (Working name)
  • THE ABBEYFIELD SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property