Accounts and annual returns THE UNITED CHARITIES OF ST MARTIN

Charity number: 200733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required