ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHGATE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 200736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 07 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required