ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHGATE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 200736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £9.23k £6.83k £9.92k £7.72k £7.54k
Total expenditure £7.44k £8.70k £9.58k £7.71k £13.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A