TAVISTOCK, WHITCHURCH AND DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION TRUST FUND

Charity number: 200782
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catharine Mary Hipsey Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
Jennifer Page Trustee 16 May 2016 None on record
SANDRA JANE DODD Trustee 28 October 2013 None on record
Janet Singleton Trustee 16 May 2016 None on record
Graham William MANNING Chair 09 June 2014 None on record
DEBO SELLIS Trustee 19 May 2008
TAVISTOCK SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND (KNOWN AS TAVISTOCK COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND) Charity reporting is up to date
Tracy Oxborough Trustee 16 May 2016 None on record
Kate KELLY Trustee 13 October 2014 None on record
Diana McDowell Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record