CALVERTON ALMSHOUSES CHARITY

Charity number: 200821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.12k £18.93k £18.92k £48.99k £29.13k
Total expenditure £15.47k £15.82k £21.93k £52.02k £20.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £30.00k £10.00k