WOODROFFE AND TUCKER'S CHARITIES (KNOWN AS CANDLEMAS MONEY)

Charity number: 200869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £10.54k £10.86k £10.50k £11.27k £10.72k
Total expenditure £4.96k £3.16k £19.86k £7.52k £6.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A