Accounts and annual returns FITZHERBERT AND MOODY CHARITY

Charity number: 201031
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required