GOOD NEIGHBOURS AMERSHAM AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 201032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.58k £16.62k £14.86k £14.86k £5.98k
Total expenditure £9.74k £12.18k £17.83k £17.79k £6.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A