OLD PARK WARD OLD AGE PENSIONERS FUND

Charity number: 201037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required