LITCHBOROUGH PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 201062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 25 July 2020 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 15 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required