Accounts and annual returns ANGIERS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 201068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 March 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required