HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 201081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download