HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 201081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.19m £4.83m £5.36m £6.35m £6.70m
Total expenditure £3.74m £4.07m £4.87m £4.82m £4.88m
Income from government contracts £749.97k £814.21k £981.65k £981.27k £1.27m
Income from government grants £308.17k £446.84k £447.41k £320.78k £504.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £615.42k £713.56k £1.03m £967.14k £1.26m
Income - Other trading activities £304.43k £423.70k £276.59k £403.79k £280.79k
Income - Charitable activities £3.22m £3.65m £4.02m £4.88m £5.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £34.15k £35.43k £37.51k £38.54k £37.26k
Income - Other £11.23k £6.69k £5.39k £65.23k £101.21k
Income - Legacies £126.61k £432.25k £650.32k £376.00k £859.11k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.16m £3.55m £4.40m £4.24m £4.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £576.88k £516.35k £469.17k £578.18k £499.45k
Expenditure - Governance £70.25k £78.19k £74.09k £77.62k £82.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £8.38k £0 £40.51k £18.22k £68.86k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0