Trustees HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT WILDLIFE TRUST
Charity number: 201081

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jordan OBE | Chair | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Vine | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Coyle MBE | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julian Roberts | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Green-Wilkinson | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Lesley Kirk | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen McCormack | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Cox | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Lesley Chin | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Sonnex | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Page | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER LANGFORD | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|||||
ANDREW LEE | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Prescott | Trustee | 06 June 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.