DAME MARY YATE CHARITY

Charity number: 201092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 February 2021 06 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2020 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2017 Not Required