DAME MARY YATE CHARITY

Charity number: 201092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 02/02/2017 02/02/2018 02/02/2019 02/02/2020 02/02/2021
Total gross income £5.00k £4.84k £5.68k £5.14k £14.67k
Total expenditure £2.00k £2.00k £9.65k £19.91k £62.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A