Financial history SOUTHMEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 201099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £85.12k £69.70k £77.80k £52.26k £64.10k
Total expenditure £84.50k £102.59k £75.74k £48.27k £59.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.69k N/A N/A £31.79k £33.59k