STOKE SAINT MILBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 201158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 September 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 07 September 2020 405 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 01 November 2017 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required