Accounts and annual returns JOSEPH ASHCROFT FOR COALS FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 201192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required