THE STRANGWAYS VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 201212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 05 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 08 February 2017 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required