THE STRANGWAYS VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 201212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £960 £960 £960 £987 £990
Total expenditure £890 £890 £775 £900 £790
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A