Accounts and annual returns EATON SOCON CHARITIES

Charity number: 201215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 November 2022 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 March 2021 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required