THE MAGDALEN LANDS OR THE CHARITY LANDS

Charity number: 201231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 March 2020 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 March 2019 04 March 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 March 2018 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 March 2016 25 February 2017 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2016 Not Required