THE MAGDALEN LANDS OR THE CHARITY LANDS

Charity number: 201231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/03/2016 04/03/2017 04/03/2018 04/03/2019 04/03/2020
Total gross income £353 £576 £396 £475 £383
Total expenditure £400 £490 £450 £500 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A