MERCY HOUSE OF WILLIAM FRY

Charity number: 201233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.32k £11.44k £18.65k £15.97k £12.82k
Total expenditure £9.17k £2.35k £7.94k £12.62k £5.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A