Trustees NORTHAMPTONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
Charity number: 201240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edwin Leonard Slinn | Chair | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel Benjamin Jeffrey John McCreedy | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Peter Andrew Michael O'Malley | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|||||
TRISTAN FRANCIS WALLACE MCMULLAN | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|||||
SUSAN FRANCIS | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|||||
HAFIZ KHANDWALA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.