STREATLEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 201298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £813 £839 £846 £852 £860
Total expenditure £760 £814 £621 £750 £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A