Financial history The Officers' Association Benevolent Fund

Charity number: 201321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £3.49m £3.50m £2.65m £2.36m £1.99m
Total expenditure £4.11m £4.32m £3.96m £3.39m £2.82m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.39m £2.46m £1.71m £1.43m £1.03m
Income - Other trading activities £36.00k £56.00k £55.00k £63.00k £158.00k
Income - Charitable activities £417.00k £334.00k £263.00k £263.00k £350.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £647.00k £644.00k £622.00k £605.00k £448.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £290.00k £33.00k £0 £0 £3.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.11m £4.06m £3.83m £3.23m £2.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £58.00k £56.00k £32.00k £30.00k £34.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £50.00k £50.00k £20.00k £30.00k £20.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £266.00k £133.00k £162.00k £234.00k