Accounts and annual returns THE HORDLE DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 201328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 11 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 27 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 22 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required