Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ALTON HOSPITALS

Charity number: 201424
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 March 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required