Financial history SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY

Charity number: 201486
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £301.57k £308.24k £326.67k £342.92k £346.58k
Total expenditure £350.22k £391.94k £0 £404.14k £392.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A