SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY

Charity number: 201486
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL FREDERICK WILKINSON Trustee 01 February 2016
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
JOHN NIGHTINGALE Trustee
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
SALLY BEARDSWORTH Trustee 18 May 2018
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
KINGSTHORPE MANOR AND TOWN CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
THE KINGSTHORPE MOORS TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
KERR HOUSE CHARITY
COMMUNITY LAW SERVICE(NORTHAMPTON AND COUNTY) Charity reporting is up to date
DANIELLE STONE MA Trustee 18 May 2018
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
THE NORTHAMPTON THEATRES TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
NORTHAMPTON TOWN OF SANCTUARY Recently registered
MRS JENNY CONROY Trustee
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
THE CAMROSE COMMUNITY TOY LIBRARY Charity reporting is up to date
CLLR ANNA SARAH KING Trustee 01 February 2016
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
WENDY ANN HOWES Trustee
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
ULRIC EGERTON GRAVESANDE Trustee
NORTHAMPTON AFRO-CARIBBEAN ORGANISATION Charity reporting is 1820 days late
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
MR TIM HADLAND Chair None on record
FRANCES HELEN WIRE Trustee
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
JANET EVELINE MARCH Trustee 13 December 2011 None on record
PHILIP LESLIE AGER Trustee
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
JEAN BULTEEL Trustee
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
JAMIE LANE Trustee 18 May 2018
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
Terence Whenham Trustee 28 February 2014
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date
ANDREW STUART JOHN SIMPSON Trustee 21 July 2011 None on record
Anthony Perry Trustee 09 December 2019
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Charity reporting is up to date