ROCK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 201575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £51.97k £45.66k £42.78k £39.54k £62.04k
Total expenditure £39.11k £35.33k £30.56k £36.43k £42.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £454