Trustees ROCK VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 201575

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Griffiths | Chair | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Tipper | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Moore | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Wightman | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Emmings | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Hall | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hopkins | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Len Pitman | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Brown | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hall | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Francis Cratchley | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barry Merchant | Trustee | 01 November 1995 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.