ELY DIOCESAN COMMITTEE FOR FAMILY AND SOCIAL WELFARE

Charity number: 201587
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED THE 12TH JULY 1967 AS AMENDED ON THE 12TH JULY 1972 AND 16 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
A)TO UNDERTAKE FAMILY AND SOCIAL WELFARE AS AN INTEGRAL PART OF THE WORK OF THE CHURCH AND TO ENLIST THE SYMPATHY ,INTEREST AND SUPPORT OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE DIOCESE. B)TO RAISE AND ADMINISTER FUNDS FOR CARRYING ON THE WORK OF THE COMMITTEE. C)TO FOUND AND MAINTAIN INSTITUTIONS NEEDFUL FOR THE WORK,AND TO ARRANGE FOR THEIR MANAGEMENT AND STAFFING. D)TO BRING CHRISTIAN INFLUENCE TO BEAR ON ALL FAMILY AND SOCIAL WELFARE QUESTIONS.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 22 December 1961 : registered
  • 13 November 2013 : removed (REMOVED BY APPLICATION)
Other names
  • C F S W (Working name)
  • ELY DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY AND SOCIAL WELFARE (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information